Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB345 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2019

                            S.B. No. 345


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State
 Forest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 88, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 88.1085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 88.1085.  USE OF LAND IN WILLIAM GOODRICH JONES STATE
 FOREST. (a)  For the purpose of this section, the "Jones State
 Forest" means the real property owned by the state for the use and
 benefit of The Texas A&M University System to demonstrate
 reforestation work and forest management work under the Texas A&M
 Forest Service, consisting of approximately 1,722 acres in
 Montgomery County, and formally dedicated and named the William
 Goodrich Jones State Forest.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the entire
 territory of the Jones State Forest must remain natural, scenic,
 undeveloped, and open in a manner that maintains the tree canopy
 cover of the forest. No statute, rule, policy, or ordinance may be
 enforced with respect to the territory of the Jones State Forest,
 other than a statute, rule, policy, or ordinance that protects and
 conserves the natural resources, air quality, or water quality of
 the Jones State Forest.
 (c)  This section does not preclude the Texas Department of
 Transportation, for the current operation or future expansion of
 Farm-to-Market Road 1488, from:
 (1)  using an easement that is owned by the state for
 the benefit of the department for a highway purpose; or
 (2)  acquiring an additional interest in real property.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 345 passed the Senate on
 March 27, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 345 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 118,
 Nays 26, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor