|
06/14/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Record vote RV#1424
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Amended 1-Canales
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 4-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 8, Section 10(b)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Motion to table fails 4-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 4-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amendment tabled 3-Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Amended 2-Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Passed CS
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|