4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to outdoor advertising signs regulated by the Texas |
---|
6 | 10 | | Department of Transportation. |
---|
7 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 391.038, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 13 | | to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 14 | | Sec. 391.038. SIGN HEIGHT. (a) Except as otherwise |
---|
11 | 15 | | provided by this section, a sign may not be higher than 60 feet, |
---|
12 | 16 | | excluding a cutout that extends above the rectangular border of the |
---|
13 | 17 | | sign, measured: |
---|
14 | 18 | | (1) from the grade level of the centerline of the |
---|
15 | 19 | | main-traveled way, not including a frontage road of a controlled |
---|
16 | 20 | | access highway, closest to the sign at a point perpendicular to the |
---|
17 | 21 | | sign location; or |
---|
18 | 22 | | (2) if the main-traveled way is below grade, from the |
---|
19 | 23 | | base of the sign structure [This section applies only to a sign |
---|
20 | 24 | | existing on March 1, 2017, that was erected before that date]. |
---|
21 | 25 | | (a-1) Subsection (a) does not apply to a sign regulated by a |
---|
22 | 26 | | municipality certified for local control under an agreement with |
---|
23 | 27 | | the department as provided by department rule. |
---|
24 | 28 | | (b) A sign existing on March 1, 2017, that was erected |
---|
25 | 29 | | before that date [described by Subsection (a)] may not be higher |
---|
26 | 30 | | than 85 feet, excluding a cutout that extends above the rectangular |
---|
27 | 31 | | border of the sign, measured: |
---|
28 | 32 | | (1) from the grade level of the centerline of the |
---|
29 | 33 | | main-traveled way, not including a frontage road of a controlled |
---|
30 | 34 | | access highway, closest to the sign at a point perpendicular to the |
---|
31 | 35 | | sign location; or |
---|
32 | 36 | | (2) if the main-traveled way is below grade, from the |
---|
33 | 37 | | base of the sign structure. |
---|
34 | | - | (c) A person who holds a permit for a sign existing on March |
---|
35 | | - | 1, 2017, that was erected before that date may rebuild the [a] sign |
---|
36 | | - | [described by Subsection (a) without obtaining a new or amended |
---|
37 | | - | permit from the department], provided that the sign is rebuilt at |
---|
38 | | - | the same location where the sign existed on that date [March 1, |
---|
39 | | - | 2017, and] at a height that does not exceed the lesser of: |
---|
40 | | - | (1) the height of the sign on March 1, 2017; or |
---|
41 | | - | (2) 85 feet [that date]. |
---|
42 | | - | (c-1) Except as provided by Subsection (c-2), before |
---|
43 | | - | rebuilding a sign under Subsection (c), the person who holds the |
---|
44 | | - | permit for the sign must obtain a new or amended permit if required |
---|
45 | | - | by: |
---|
46 | | - | (1) a provision of this chapter; or |
---|
47 | | - | (2) a rule adopted to implement a provision of this |
---|
48 | | - | chapter. |
---|
49 | | - | (c-2) Subsection (c-1) does not apply to the rebuilding of a |
---|
50 | | - | sign under Subsection (c) if the person who holds the permit for the |
---|
51 | | - | sign rebuilds because of damage to the sign caused by: |
---|
52 | | - | (1) wind or a natural disaster; |
---|
53 | | - | (2) a motor vehicle accident; or |
---|
54 | | - | (3) an act of God. |
---|
55 | | - | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 391, Transportation Code, |
---|
56 | | - | is amended by adding Section 391.0381 to read as follows: |
---|
57 | | - | Sec. 391.0381. VIOLATIONS BY CERTAIN PERSONS OF SIGN HEIGHT |
---|
58 | | - | PROVISION: PERMIT DENIAL. (a) This section applies only to a |
---|
59 | | - | person who has permits for 100 or more signs. |
---|
60 | | - | (b) If a sign for which a person has a permit violates |
---|
61 | | - | Section 391.038 or a rule adopted to implement that section, the |
---|
62 | | - | commission may, after notice and an opportunity for a hearing |
---|
63 | | - | before the commission, deny an application for a permit requested |
---|
64 | | - | by the person on or after the date of the violation. |
---|
65 | | - | (c) After notice and an opportunity for hearing before the |
---|
66 | | - | commission, the commission may deny an application for a permit or |
---|
67 | | - | permit renewal for a sign if another sign for which the person has a |
---|
68 | | - | permit is in violation of Section 391.038. The commission is not |
---|
69 | | - | required to issue a permit to or renew a permit of the person for a |
---|
70 | | - | sign until all signs for which the person has a permit comply with |
---|
71 | | - | Section 391.038. |
---|
72 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
73 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
74 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
75 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 357 passed the Senate on |
---|
76 | | - | March 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
77 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 21, 2019, by the |
---|
78 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
79 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
81 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 357 passed the House, with |
---|
82 | | - | amendments, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 116, |
---|
83 | | - | Nays 17, two present not voting. |
---|
84 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
85 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
86 | | - | Approved: |
---|
87 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
88 | | - | Date |
---|
89 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 38 | + | (c) A person may rebuild a sign existing on March 1, 2017, |
---|
| 39 | + | that was erected before that date [described by Subsection (a)] |
---|
| 40 | + | without obtaining a new or amended permit from the department, |
---|
| 41 | + | provided that the sign is rebuilt at the same location where the |
---|
| 42 | + | sign existed on March 1, 2017, and at a height that does not exceed |
---|
| 43 | + | the height of the sign on that date. |
---|
| 44 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|