Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019