Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019