Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB372 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2019

                            S.B. No. 372


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of an open-enrollment charter school to
 employ security personnel, commission peace officers, and have
 school resource officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.104, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The governing body of an open-enrollment charter
 school may:
 (1)  employ security personnel and commission peace
 officers in the same manner as a board of trustees of a school
 district under Section 37.081; and
 (2)  enter into a memorandum of understanding with a
 local law enforcement agency to assign a school resource officer,
 as that term is defined by Section 1701.601, Occupations Code, to
 the school.
 (a-2)  A reference in law to a peace officer commissioned
 under Section 37.081 includes a peace officer commissioned by an
 open-enrollment charter school in accordance with Subsection
 (a-1), and a charter school peace officer has the same powers,
 duties, and immunities as a peace officer commissioned under that
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 372 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 24, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 372 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121,
 Nays 20, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor