Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019