|
06/10/2019
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/10/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/28/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#1993
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#1453
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Pacheco
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Amended 1-Paddie
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 3-T. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Meyer
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Amendment amended 2-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Meyer
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|