Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019