Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019