Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB971 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/06/2019

                            S.B. No. 971


 AN ACT
 relating to peace officer training on recognizing and recording
 circumstances that indicate strangulation in certain cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.253(d), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Training in documentation of cases required by
 Subsection (b) shall include instruction in:
 (1)  making a written account of the extent of injuries
 sustained by the victim of an alleged offense;
 (2)  recording by photograph or videotape the area in
 which an alleged offense occurred and the victim's injuries; [and]
 (3)  recognizing and recording a victim's statement
 that may be admissible as evidence in a proceeding concerning the
 matter about which the statement was made; and
 (4)  recognizing and recording circumstances
 indicating that a victim may have been assaulted in the manner
 described by Section 22.01(b)(2)(B), Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1701.352(f), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  Training in documentation of cases required by
 Subsection (b) shall include instruction in:
 (1)  making a written account of the extent of injuries
 sustained by the victim of an alleged offense;
 (2)  recording by photograph or videotape the area in
 which an alleged offense occurred and the victim's injuries; [and]
 (3)  recognizing and recording a victim's statement
 that may be admissible as evidence in a proceeding concerning the
 matter about which the statement was made; and
 (4)  recognizing and recording circumstances
 indicating that a victim may have been assaulted in the manner
 described by Section 22.01(b)(2)(B), Penal Code.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall establish or modify training
 programs as necessary to comply with Section 1701.253, Occupations
 Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  The minimum curriculum requirements under Section
 1701.253(d), Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, apply only
 to a peace officer who first begins to satisfy those requirements on
 or after January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 971 passed the Senate on
 April 4, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 971 passed the House on
 May 3, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor