04/02/2019 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |||
House | 04/02/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | House passage reported | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Record vote RV#82 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Read | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |