Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR56 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/27/2019

                            S.C.R. No. 56


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Section 17, Article III, Texas Constitution,
 provides that neither house of the legislature may adjourn for more
 than three days without the consent of the other house; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED by the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas, That
 each house grant the other permission to adjourn for more than three
 days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 27, 2019, and
 ending on Monday, April 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 56 was adopted by the Senate
 on March 25, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 56 was adopted by the House
 on March 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Received:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Secretary of State