06/10/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/28/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/27/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/27/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/27/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/27/2019 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/27/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/27/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/26/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/25/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |