2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with the |
---|
6 | 6 | | passing of William James Boring of Tyler on April 5, 2019, at the |
---|
7 | 7 | | age of 89; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, Jamie Boring was born to Annie Mae and Fletcher |
---|
9 | 9 | | Boring on October 4, 1929, in Tyler, and he grew up with two |
---|
10 | 10 | | siblings, Nancy and Gary; a graduate of Tyler High School, he |
---|
11 | 11 | | enlisted in the U.S. Marine Corps at the end of World War II and |
---|
12 | 12 | | became an intelligence officer, specializing in high speed |
---|
13 | 13 | | intercept cryptography and later training air force and army |
---|
14 | 14 | | officers; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Boring continued his education at North Texas |
---|
16 | 16 | | State University, where he earned a master's degree in accounting; |
---|
17 | 17 | | he went on to enjoy a successful and varied career that included |
---|
18 | 18 | | owning the Tyler Employment Agency, working as a sales manager for |
---|
19 | 19 | | Western Foundry, and making a name for himself as a real estate |
---|
20 | 20 | | agent and developer; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Boring took an active role in his community, |
---|
22 | 22 | | serving as chair of the Smith County Appraisal Review Board and as a |
---|
23 | 23 | | member of the Tyler Board of Realtors Ethics Committee and the Texas |
---|
24 | 24 | | Department of Transportation Right of Way Board; strong in his |
---|
25 | 25 | | faith, he worshipped at Green Acres Baptist Church and attended |
---|
26 | 26 | | Bible study with his dear friends for more than 40 years; he was |
---|
27 | 27 | | cherished deeply and regarded as a role model by many people, who |
---|
28 | 28 | | admired him for his warmth, his integrity, and his commitment to the |
---|
29 | 29 | | needs of others; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | WHEREAS, On April 19, 1968, Mr. Boring married his high |
---|
31 | 31 | | school sweetheart and the love of his life, the former Joan |
---|
32 | 32 | | Vanderpool, who preceded him in death in 2006; he took great pride |
---|
33 | 33 | | in his children, Nancy, Elizabeth, and John, and he had the pleasure |
---|
34 | 34 | | of welcoming into the family seven grandchildren, Elizabeth, |
---|
35 | 35 | | Amanda, Sarah, Cal, Rachel, Jamie, and Bryce, as well as three |
---|
36 | 36 | | great-grandchildren, Brooklynn, Blake, and William; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | WHEREAS, Although Jamie Boring is deeply missed, memories of |
---|
38 | 38 | | his wisdom, his kindness, and his devotion to his loved ones remain |
---|
39 | 39 | | to comfort and inspire those he leaves behind; now, therefore, be it |
---|
40 | 40 | | RESOLVED, That the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
41 | 41 | | hereby pay tribute to the life of William James Boring and extend |
---|
42 | 42 | | sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing; and, be it further |
---|
43 | 43 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be |
---|
44 | 44 | | prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of |
---|
45 | 45 | | Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of |
---|
46 | 46 | | Jamie Boring. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 65 was adopted by the Senate |
---|
52 | | - | on May 25, 2019, by a rising vote. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
55 | | - | I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 65 was adopted by the House |
---|
56 | | - | on May 27, 2019, by a rising vote. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
59 | | - | Approved: |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Date |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Governor |
---|