Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR65 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            S.C.R. No. 65


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with the
 passing of William James Boring of Tyler on April 5, 2019, at the
 age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Jamie Boring was born to Annie Mae and Fletcher
 Boring on October 4, 1929, in Tyler, and he grew up with two
 siblings, Nancy and Gary; a graduate of Tyler High School, he
 enlisted in the U.S. Marine Corps at the end of World War II and
 became an intelligence officer, specializing in high speed
 intercept cryptography and later training air force and army
 officers; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Boring continued his education at North Texas
 State University, where he earned a master's degree in accounting;
 he went on to enjoy a successful and varied career that included
 owning the Tyler Employment Agency, working as a sales manager for
 Western Foundry, and making a name for himself as a real estate
 agent and developer; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Boring took an active role in his community,
 serving as chair of the Smith County Appraisal Review Board and as a
 member of the Tyler Board of Realtors Ethics Committee and the Texas
 Department of Transportation Right of Way Board; strong in his
 faith, he worshipped at Green Acres Baptist Church and attended
 Bible study with his dear friends for more than 40 years; he was
 cherished deeply and regarded as a role model by many people, who
 admired him for his warmth, his integrity, and his commitment to the
 needs of others; and
 WHEREAS, On April 19, 1968, Mr. Boring married his high
 school sweetheart and the love of his life, the former Joan
 Vanderpool, who preceded him in death in 2006; he took great pride
 in his children, Nancy, Elizabeth, and John, and he had the pleasure
 of welcoming into the family seven grandchildren, Elizabeth,
 Amanda, Sarah, Cal, Rachel, Jamie, and Bryce, as well as three
 great-grandchildren, Brooklynn, Blake, and William; and
 WHEREAS, Although Jamie Boring is deeply missed, memories of
 his wisdom, his kindness, and his devotion to his loved ones remain
 to comfort and inspire those he leaves behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of William James Boring and extend
 sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Jamie Boring.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 65 was adopted by the Senate
 on May 25, 2019, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 65 was adopted by the House
 on May 27, 2019, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor