Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR273

Caption

Recognizing February 26, 2019, as University of Houston-Downtown Day.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HR493

Recognizing February 21, 2017, as University of Houston--Downtown Day at the State Capitol.

TX HCR77

Recognizing March 1, 2017, as University of Houston--Victoria Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR286

Recognizing March 7, 2023, as University of Houston-Victoria Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR522

Recognizing February 25, 2019, as University of Houston-Victoria Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR583

Recognizing February 23, 2015, as University of Houston System Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR424

Recognizing February 13, 2013, as University of Houston System Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR425

Recognizing March 11, 2025, as University of Houston-Victoria Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR225

Recognizing February 25, 2019, as University of Houston-Victoria Day.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.