Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1013 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/14/2021

                            By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1013
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a decree of divorce include the date
 of the marriage.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 6, Family Code, is amended
 by adding Section 6.712 to read as follows:
 Sec. 6.712.  DATE OF MARRIAGE REQUIREMENT IN FINAL DECREE.
 (a) In a suit for dissolution of a marriage in which the court
 grants a divorce, the court shall state the date of the marriage in
 the decree of divorce.
 (b)  This section does not apply to a suit for dissolution of
 a marriage described by Section 2.401(a)(2).
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a suit for dissolution of a marriage filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A suit for dissolution of a marriage
 filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the suit was filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *