Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021