Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1027 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021