Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021