Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB129 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021