Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB129 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            By: González of El Paso, et al. H.B. No. 129
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 129 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to digital citizenship instruction in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002(z), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (z)  The State Board of Education by rule shall require each
 school district to incorporate instruction in digital citizenship
 into the district's curriculum, including information regarding
 the potential criminal consequences of cyberbullying, and require
 students enrolled in grade level six to complete instruction in
 digital citizenship as part of the district's social studies
 curriculum. In this subsection:
 (1)  "Cyberbullying" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 37.0832.
 (2)  "Digital citizenship" means the standards of
 appropriate, responsible, and healthy online behavior, including:
 (A)  the ability to access, analyze, evaluate,
 create, and act on all forms of digital communication;
 (B)  digital ethics, etiquette, respectful
 discourse with people who have differing opinions, safety,
 security, digital footprint, and the identification of rhetoric
 that incites violence;
 (C)  cyberbullying prevention and response; and
 (D)  the importance of the right to freedom of
 speech contained in the Bill of Rights of the Constitution of the
 United States, including:
 (i)  the central role that the right to
 freedom of speech has in the history of the United States; and
 (ii)  the applicability of protections for
 freedom of speech for online interaction.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *