Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021