Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1461 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021