1 | | - | By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1461 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
3 | | - | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Education; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | 87R16053 MEW-F |
---|
| 2 | + | By: Parker, Anchia, Stucky, Talarico, H.B. No. 1461 |
---|
| 3 | + | Lambert, et al. |
---|
7 | 4 | | |
---|
8 | 5 | | |
---|
9 | 6 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 7 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 8 | | relating to a study by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas |
---|
12 | 9 | | regarding the use of health reimbursement accounts in conjunction |
---|
13 | 10 | | with Medicare plans available through the individual marketplace to |
---|
14 | 11 | | provide health and pharmacy benefit coverage for certain retired |
---|
15 | 12 | | school employees. |
---|
16 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
17 | 14 | | SECTION 1. STUDY. (a) The Teacher Retirement System of |
---|
18 | 15 | | Texas shall conduct a study to evaluate the use of health |
---|
19 | 16 | | reimbursement accounts in conjunction with Medicare plans |
---|
20 | 17 | | available through the individual marketplace as a means to provide |
---|
21 | 18 | | health and pharmacy benefit coverage under Chapter 1575, Insurance |
---|
22 | 19 | | Code, for Medicare-eligible retired school employees and their |
---|
23 | 20 | | spouses. |
---|
24 | 21 | | (b) The evaluation must consider: |
---|
25 | 22 | | (1) using claims experience and premium data from the |
---|
26 | 23 | | most recent two years, the affordability and availability of |
---|
27 | 24 | | Medicare plans available through the individual marketplace to |
---|
28 | 25 | | Medicare-eligible retirees and their spouses compared to health |
---|
29 | 26 | | benefit plans available to those retirees and their spouses under |
---|
30 | 27 | | Chapter 1575, Insurance Code; |
---|
31 | 28 | | (2) provider availability under Medicare plans |
---|
32 | 29 | | available through the individual marketplace; and |
---|
33 | 30 | | (3) any other items the Teacher Retirement System of |
---|
34 | 31 | | Texas determines are relevant to the system's long-term ability to |
---|
35 | 32 | | provide health and pharmacy benefits to Medicare-eligible retirees |
---|
36 | 33 | | and their spouses considering the demographic, geographic, and |
---|
37 | 34 | | socioeconomic characteristics of the Medicare-eligible retirees |
---|
38 | 35 | | and spouses participating in the group program under Chapter 1575, |
---|
39 | 36 | | Insurance Code. |
---|
40 | 37 | | (c) In conducting the study under this section, the Teacher |
---|
41 | 38 | | Retirement System of Texas: |
---|
42 | 39 | | (1) may contract or collaborate with entities having |
---|
43 | 40 | | industry-leading expertise and experience in the individual |
---|
44 | 41 | | marketplace; and |
---|
45 | 42 | | (2) shall invite comment and input from interested |
---|
46 | 43 | | stakeholders, including active and retired school employees. |
---|
47 | 44 | | SECTION 2. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2021, the |
---|
48 | 45 | | Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall submit to the governor, |
---|
49 | 46 | | lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and |
---|
50 | 47 | | Legislative Budget Board a written report of the study conducted |
---|
51 | 48 | | under Section 1 of this Act. The report must include the findings |
---|
52 | 49 | | and legislative recommendations of the Teacher Retirement System of |
---|
53 | 50 | | Texas. |
---|
54 | 51 | | SECTION 3. EXPIRATION DATE. This Act expires January 1, |
---|
55 | 52 | | 2023. |
---|
56 | 53 | | SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
57 | 54 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
58 | 55 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
59 | 56 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
60 | 57 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|