Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1461 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1461
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas
 regarding the use of health reimbursement accounts in conjunction
 with Medicare plans available through the individual marketplace to
 provide health and pharmacy benefit coverage for certain retired
 school employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  STUDY. (a) The Teacher Retirement System of
 Texas shall conduct a study to evaluate the use of health
 reimbursement accounts in conjunction with Medicare plans
 available through the individual marketplace as a means to provide
 health and pharmacy benefit coverage under Chapter 1575, Insurance
 Code, for Medicare-eligible retired school employees and their
 spouses.
 (b)  The evaluation must consider:
 (1)  using claims experience and premium data from the
 most recent two years, the affordability and availability of
 Medicare plans available through the individual marketplace to
 Medicare-eligible retirees and their spouses compared to health
 benefit plans available to those retirees and their spouses under
 Chapter 1575, Insurance Code;
 (2)  provider availability under Medicare plans
 available through the individual marketplace; and
 (3)  any other items the Teacher Retirement System of
 Texas determines are relevant to the system's long-term ability to
 provide health and pharmacy benefits to Medicare-eligible retirees
 and their spouses considering the demographic, geographic, and
 socioeconomic characteristics of the Medicare-eligible retirees
 and spouses participating in the group program under Chapter 1575,
 Insurance Code.
 (c)  In conducting the study under this section, the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas:
 (1)  may contract or collaborate with entities having
 industry-leading expertise and experience in the individual
 marketplace; and
 (2)  shall invite comment and input from interested
 stakeholders, including active and retired school employees.
 SECTION 2.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2021, the
 Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall submit to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 Legislative Budget Board a written report of the study conducted
 under Section 1 of this Act. The report must include the findings
 and legislative recommendations of the Teacher Retirement System of
 Texas.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION DATE. This Act expires January 1,
 2023.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *