Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021