Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1589 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021