Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021