Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021