1 | | - | H.B. No. 1664 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: White, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Eckhardt) H.B. No. 1664 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1664 By: Campbell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the reinstatement of eligibility for medical assistance |
---|
6 | 14 | | of certain children placed in juvenile facilities. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 32.0264, Human Resources |
---|
9 | 17 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 32.0264. SUSPENSION AND [AUTOMATIC] REINSTATEMENT OF |
---|
11 | 19 | | ELIGIBILITY FOR CHILDREN IN JUVENILE FACILITIES. |
---|
12 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 32.0264, Human Resources Code, is |
---|
13 | 21 | | amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (b-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), if, during the period |
---|
15 | 23 | | a child is placed in a juvenile facility, the child is hospitalized |
---|
16 | 24 | | or becomes an inpatient in another type of medical facility, the |
---|
17 | 25 | | commission shall reinstate the child's eligibility for medical |
---|
18 | 26 | | assistance during the period of the child's inpatient stay. The |
---|
19 | 27 | | executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to implement |
---|
20 | 28 | | this subsection, including rules governing the procedure for |
---|
21 | 29 | | reinstating a child's eligibility for medical assistance under this |
---|
22 | 30 | | subsection. |
---|
23 | 31 | | SECTION 3. If before implementing Section 32.0264(b-1), |
---|
24 | 32 | | Human Resources Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human |
---|
25 | 33 | | Services Commission determines that a memorandum of understanding |
---|
26 | 34 | | between the commission and the Texas Juvenile Justice Department or |
---|
27 | 35 | | the adoption of policies or procedures is necessary for |
---|
28 | 36 | | implementation of that provision, the commission may delay |
---|
29 | 37 | | implementing that provision until the earlier of: |
---|
30 | 38 | | (1) the date any necessary memorandum of |
---|
31 | 39 | | understanding, policies, and procedures are adopted; or |
---|
32 | 40 | | (2) March 1, 2022. |
---|
33 | 41 | | SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
34 | 42 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
35 | 43 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
36 | 44 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
37 | 45 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
38 | 46 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
39 | 47 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1664 was passed by the House on May |
---|
43 | | - | 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 15, 1 present, not |
---|
44 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
45 | | - | No. 1664 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 16, |
---|
46 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
49 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1664 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
50 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
51 | | - | 0. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 48 | + | * * * * * |
---|