Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1664 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 1664


 AN ACT
 relating to the reinstatement of eligibility for medical assistance
 of certain children placed in juvenile facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 32.0264, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0264.  SUSPENSION AND [AUTOMATIC] REINSTATEMENT OF
 ELIGIBILITY FOR CHILDREN IN JUVENILE FACILITIES.
 SECTION 2.  Section 32.0264, Human Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), if, during the period
 a child is placed in a juvenile facility, the child is hospitalized
 or becomes an inpatient in another type of medical facility, the
 commission shall reinstate the child's eligibility for medical
 assistance during the period of the child's inpatient stay. The
 executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 this subsection, including rules governing the procedure for
 reinstating a child's eligibility for medical assistance under this
 subsection.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing Section 32.0264(b-1),
 Human Resources Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human
 Services Commission determines that a memorandum of understanding
 between the commission and the Texas Juvenile Justice Department or
 the adoption of policies or procedures is necessary for
 implementation of that provision, the commission may delay
 implementing that provision until the earlier of:
 (1)  the date any necessary memorandum of
 understanding, policies, and procedures are adopted; or
 (2)  March 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1664 was passed by the House on May
 11, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 130, Nays 15, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1664 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 128, Nays 16,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1664 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor