Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1754 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021