Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1754 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa, West) H.B. No. 1754
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021;
 May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1754 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of suicide prevention information on
 certain student identification cards issued by a public school or
 public institution of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.353 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.353.  SUICIDE PREVENTION INFORMATION REQUIRED ON
 CERTAIN STUDENT IDENTIFICATION CARDS. Each student identification
 card issued by a public school to a student in grade six or higher:
 (1)  must have printed on either side of the card the
 telephone number for:
 (A)  the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline;
 and
 (B)  the Crisis Text Line; and
 (2)  may have printed on either side of the card the
 telephone number for a local suicide prevention hotline, if
 available.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.91941 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.91941.  SUICIDE PREVENTION INFORMATION REQUIRED ON
 STUDENT IDENTIFICATION CARD. (a)  In this section, "institution of
 higher education" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each student identification card issued by an
 institution of higher education:
 (1)  must have printed on either side of the card the
 telephone number for:
 (A)  the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline;
 (B)  the Crisis Text Line; and
 (C)  the campus police department or security for
 the campus at which the student to whom the card is issued regularly
 attends classes or, if the campus does not have a campus police
 department or security, a local nonemergency police contact; and
 (2)  may have printed on either side of the card the
 telephone number for a local suicide prevention hotline, if
 available.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Notwithstanding Sections 38.353 and
 51.91941, Education Code, as added by this Act, if, on January 1,
 2022, a public school or a public institution of higher education
 subject to the requirements of Section 38.353 or 51.91941,
 Education Code, as applicable, has a supply of unissued student
 identification cards that do not comply with the applicable
 requirements of those sections, the public school or public
 institution of higher education may issue those student
 identification cards until the supply of cards is depleted.
 (b)  Sections 38.353 and 51.91941, Education Code, as added
 by this Act, apply only to an initial or replacement student
 identification card issued on or after June 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *