Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1802 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/29/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 29, 2021       TO: Honorable Stephanie Klick, Chair, House Committee on Public Health     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB1802 by Dominguez (Relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating post-traumatic stress disorder.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1802, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a negative impact of ($1,440,307) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2022($714,453)2023($725,854)2024($745,987)2025$02026$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds5552022($714,453)($148,329)2023($725,854)($150,696)2024($745,987)($154,876)2025$0$02026$0$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to collaborate with certain entities to conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies in the treatment of veterans with post-traumatic stress disorder. The bill would require the study to include a clinical trial and a literature review. The bill would require HHSC to submit reports on the study. This Act expires September 1, 2025. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-­thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 29, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Stephanie Klick, Chair, House Committee on Public Health     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB1802 by Dominguez (Relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating post-traumatic stress disorder.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   

TO: Honorable Stephanie Klick, Chair, House Committee on Public Health
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1802 by Dominguez (Relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating post-traumatic stress disorder.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Stephanie Klick, Chair, House Committee on Public Health

 Honorable Stephanie Klick, Chair, House Committee on Public Health

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB1802 by Dominguez (Relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating post-traumatic stress disorder.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 

 HB1802 by Dominguez (Relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating post-traumatic stress disorder.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1802, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a negative impact of ($1,440,307) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB1802, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a negative impact of ($1,440,307) through the biennium ending August 31, 2023. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2022 ($714,453)
2023 ($725,854)
2024 ($745,987)
2025 $0
2026 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2022 ($714,453) ($148,329)
2023 ($725,854) ($150,696)
2024 ($745,987) ($154,876)
2025 $0 $0
2026 $0 $0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to collaborate with certain entities to conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies in the treatment of veterans with post-traumatic stress disorder. The bill would require the study to include a clinical trial and a literature review. The bill would require HHSC to submit reports on the study. This Act expires September 1, 2025. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-­thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.

 Methodology

This analysis assumes HHSC would contract with Baylor College of Medicine to implement the provisions of the bill, including to conduct a 30-month clinical trial, perform a literature review, publish the results of the study, and certain other required activities. According to HHSC, the costs of the study are estimated to be $862,782 in All Funds in fiscal year 2022, $876,550 in All Funds in fiscal year 2023, and $900,863 in All Funds in fiscal year 2024.  

 Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 529 Hlth & Human Svcs Comm

529 Hlth & Human Svcs Comm

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AKI, JLI, SB

JMc, AKI, JLI, SB