Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1802 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021