Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1802 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2021

                            H.B. No. 1802


 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating
 post-traumatic stress disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this Act, "commission" means the Health
 and Human Services Commission.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with Baylor College of
 Medicine and in partnership with a military veterans hospital or a
 medical center that provides medical care to veterans, shall
 conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies,
 including the use of 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA),
 psilocybin, and ketamine, in the treatment of veterans who suffer
 from post-traumatic stress disorder.
 (c)  In conducting the study described by Subsection (b) of
 this section, the commission in collaboration with the Baylor
 College of Medicine shall:
 (1)  perform a clinical trial on the therapeutic
 efficacy of using psilocybin in the treatment of
 treatment-resistant post-traumatic stress disorder in veterans;
 and
 (2)  review current literature regarding:
 (A)  the safety and efficacy of
 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and
 ketamine in the treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder; and
 (B)  the access veterans have to
 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and
 ketamine for treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder in the
 United States.
 (d)  The commission shall prepare and submit to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and each member of the legislature:
 (1)  quarterly reports on the progress of the study
 conducted under this section; and
 (2)  not later than December 1, 2024, a written report
 containing the results of the study conducted under this section
 and any recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (e)  The commission shall ensure any protected health
 information collected during a clinical trial conducted under
 Subsection (c) of this section and reported under Subsection (d) of
 this section does not personally identify an individual.
 (f)  This Act expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  The Agency is required to implement this Act only
 if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
 purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the commission may, but is not
 required to, implement this Act using other appropriations
 available for the purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1802 was passed by the House on May 6,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 12, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1802 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 9,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1802 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays
 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor