1 | | - | H.B. No. 1802 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Dominguez, et al. H.B. No. 1802 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Campbell, et al.) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran |
---|
| 5 | + | Affairs & Border Security; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 6 | + | following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating |
---|
6 | 13 | | post-traumatic stress disorder. |
---|
7 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 15 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this Act, "commission" means the Health |
---|
9 | 16 | | and Human Services Commission. |
---|
10 | 17 | | (b) The commission, in collaboration with Baylor College of |
---|
11 | 18 | | Medicine and in partnership with a military veterans hospital or a |
---|
12 | 19 | | medical center that provides medical care to veterans, shall |
---|
13 | 20 | | conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies, |
---|
14 | 21 | | including the use of 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), |
---|
15 | 22 | | psilocybin, and ketamine, in the treatment of veterans who suffer |
---|
16 | 23 | | from post-traumatic stress disorder. |
---|
17 | 24 | | (c) In conducting the study described by Subsection (b) of |
---|
18 | 25 | | this section, the commission in collaboration with the Baylor |
---|
19 | 26 | | College of Medicine shall: |
---|
20 | 27 | | (1) perform a clinical trial on the therapeutic |
---|
21 | 28 | | efficacy of using psilocybin in the treatment of |
---|
22 | 29 | | treatment-resistant post-traumatic stress disorder in veterans; |
---|
23 | 30 | | and |
---|
24 | 31 | | (2) review current literature regarding: |
---|
25 | 32 | | (A) the safety and efficacy of |
---|
26 | 33 | | 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and |
---|
27 | 34 | | ketamine in the treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder; and |
---|
28 | 35 | | (B) the access veterans have to |
---|
29 | 36 | | 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and |
---|
30 | 37 | | ketamine for treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder in the |
---|
31 | 38 | | United States. |
---|
32 | 39 | | (d) The commission shall prepare and submit to the governor, |
---|
33 | 40 | | the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
34 | 41 | | representatives, and each member of the legislature: |
---|
35 | 42 | | (1) quarterly reports on the progress of the study |
---|
36 | 43 | | conducted under this section; and |
---|
37 | 44 | | (2) not later than December 1, 2024, a written report |
---|
38 | 45 | | containing the results of the study conducted under this section |
---|
39 | 46 | | and any recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
40 | 47 | | (e) The commission shall ensure any protected health |
---|
41 | 48 | | information collected during a clinical trial conducted under |
---|
42 | 49 | | Subsection (c) of this section and reported under Subsection (d) of |
---|
43 | 50 | | this section does not personally identify an individual. |
---|
44 | 51 | | (f) This Act expires September 1, 2025. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
58 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1802 was passed by the House on May 6, |
---|
59 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 12, 1 present, not |
---|
60 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
61 | | - | No. 1802 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 9, |
---|
62 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
63 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
65 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1802 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
66 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays |
---|
67 | | - | 5. |
---|
68 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
70 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
71 | | - | Date |
---|
72 | | - | __________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 57 | + | * * * * * |
---|