Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1802 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 05/17/2021

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   H.B. 1802     87R19638 MCF-D   By: Dominguez et al. (Campbell)         Veteran Affairs & Border Security         5/17/2021         Engrossed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   It has been argued that alternative forms of medical therapies could be capable of aiding veterans with treatment-resistant post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD). H.B. 1802 provides for a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies to treat these veterans, including specific requirements for clinical trials and reporting requirements.   H.B. 1802 requires the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine and in partnership with a military veterans hospital or a medical center that provides medical care to veterans, to conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies, including the use of 3,4-ethylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine in the treatment of veterans who suffer from PTSD.   The bill requires HHSC, in conducting the study, to do the following in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine:    Perform a clinical trial on the therapeutic efficacy of using psilocybin in the treatment of treatment-resistant PTSD in veterans; and Review current literature regarding the safety and efficacy of MDMA, psilocybin, and ketamine in the treatment of PTSD as well as the access veteran have to these treatments in the United States.    H.B. 1802 requires requires HHSC to prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each member of the legislature:    quarterly reports on the progress of the study; and not later than December 1, 2024, a written report containing the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or other action.    HHSC must ensure any protected health information collected during a clinical trial or reported does not personally identify an individual. The bill's provisions expire September 1, 2025.   H.B. 1802 amends current law relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating post-traumatic stress disorder.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. (a) Defines "commission" as the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC).   (b) Requires HHSC, in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine and in partnership with a military veterans hospital or a medical center that provides medical care to veterans, to conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies, including the use of 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine, in the treatment of veterans who suffer from post-traumatic stress disorder.   (c) Requires HHSC in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine, in conducting the study described by Subsection (b) of this section, to:   (1) perform a clinical trial on the therapeutic efficacy of using psilocybin in the treatment of treatment-resistant post-traumatic stress disorder in veterans; and   (2) review current literature regarding the safety and efficacy of 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine in the treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder, and regarding the access veterans have to 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine for treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder in the United States.   (d) Requires HHSC to prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the Texas House of Representatives, and each member of the legislature:   (1) quarterly reports on the progress of the study conducted under this section; and   (2) not later than December 1, 2024, a written report containing the results of the study conducted under this section and any recommendations for legislative or other action.   (e) Requires HHSC to ensure any protected health information collected during a clinical trial conducted under Subsection (c) of this section and reported under Subsection (d) of this section does not personally identify an individual.   (f) Provides that this Act expires September 1, 2025.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.     

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center H.B. 1802
87R19638 MCF-D By: Dominguez et al. (Campbell)
 Veteran Affairs & Border Security
 5/17/2021
 Engrossed

Senate Research Center

H.B. 1802

87R19638 MCF-D

By: Dominguez et al. (Campbell)

 

Veteran Affairs & Border Security

 

5/17/2021

 

Engrossed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

It has been argued that alternative forms of medical therapies could be capable of aiding veterans with treatment-resistant post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD). H.B. 1802 provides for a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies to treat these veterans, including specific requirements for clinical trials and reporting requirements.

 

H.B. 1802 requires the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine and in partnership with a military veterans hospital or a medical center that provides medical care to veterans, to conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies, including the use of 3,4-ethylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine in the treatment of veterans who suffer from PTSD.

 

The bill requires HHSC, in conducting the study, to do the following in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine:

 

 

H.B. 1802 requires requires HHSC to prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each member of the legislature:

 

 

HHSC must ensure any protected health information collected during a clinical trial or reported does not personally identify an individual. The bill's provisions expire September 1, 2025.

 

H.B. 1802 amends current law relating to a study on the use of alternative therapies for treating post-traumatic stress disorder.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. (a) Defines "commission" as the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC).

 

(b) Requires HHSC, in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine and in partnership with a military veterans hospital or a medical center that provides medical care to veterans, to conduct a study on the efficacy of using alternative therapies, including the use of 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine, in the treatment of veterans who suffer from post-traumatic stress disorder.

 

(c) Requires HHSC in collaboration with Baylor College of Medicine, in conducting the study described by Subsection (b) of this section, to:

 

(1) perform a clinical trial on the therapeutic efficacy of using psilocybin in the treatment of treatment-resistant post-traumatic stress disorder in veterans; and

 

(2) review current literature regarding the safety and efficacy of 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine in the treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder, and regarding the access veterans have to 3,4-methylenedioxymethamphetamine (MDMA), psilocybin, and ketamine for treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder in the United States.

 

(d) Requires HHSC to prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the Texas House of Representatives, and each member of the legislature:

 

(1) quarterly reports on the progress of the study conducted under this section; and

 

(2) not later than December 1, 2024, a written report containing the results of the study conducted under this section and any recommendations for legislative or other action.

 

(e) Requires HHSC to ensure any protected health information collected during a clinical trial conducted under Subsection (c) of this section and reported under Subsection (d) of this section does not personally identify an individual.

 

(f) Provides that this Act expires September 1, 2025.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2021.