Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021