Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021