1 | | - | H.B. No. 2022 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Darby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2022 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to enrollment of certain retirees in the Texas Public |
---|
6 | 12 | | School Employees Group Insurance Program. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 1575.161, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 15 | | adding Subsections (b) and (c) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the trustee by rule |
---|
11 | 17 | | shall provide one opportunity to reenroll in a health benefit plan |
---|
12 | 18 | | offered under the group program for an otherwise eligible retiree: |
---|
13 | 19 | | (1) who is eligible to enroll in Medicare; |
---|
14 | 20 | | (2) whose initial enrollment was voluntarily |
---|
15 | 21 | | terminated on or after January 1, 2017, and on or before December |
---|
16 | 22 | | 31, 2019; and |
---|
17 | 23 | | (3) who opts to reenroll on or before December 31, |
---|
18 | 24 | | 2023. |
---|
19 | 25 | | (c) Subsection (b) and this subsection expire September 1, |
---|
20 | 26 | | 2024. |
---|
21 | 27 | | SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2021, the Teacher |
---|
22 | 28 | | Retirement System of Texas shall adopt rules necessary to implement |
---|
23 | 29 | | Section 1575.161(b), Insurance Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
24 | 30 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
25 | 31 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
26 | 32 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
27 | 33 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
28 | 34 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2022 was passed by the House on May |
---|
32 | | - | 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 18, 2 present, not |
---|
33 | | - | voting. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2022 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
37 | | - | 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Date |
---|
42 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 35 | + | * * * * * |
---|