H.B. No. 2022 AN ACT relating to enrollment of certain retirees in the Texas Public School Employees Group Insurance Program. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1575.161, Insurance Code, is amended by adding Subsections (b) and (c) to read as follows: (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the trustee by rule shall provide one opportunity to reenroll in a health benefit plan offered under the group program for an otherwise eligible retiree: (1) who is eligible to enroll in Medicare; (2) whose initial enrollment was voluntarily terminated on or after January 1, 2017, and on or before December 31, 2019; and (3) who opts to reenroll on or before December 31, 2023. (c) Subsection (b) and this subsection expire September 1, 2024. SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2021, the Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section 1575.161(b), Insurance Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2022 was passed by the House on May 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 18, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2022 was passed by the Senate on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor