Senate | 05/26/2021 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Record vote RV#308 | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Filed |