Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021