Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2057 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            By: Klick (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2057
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the timing of changes to county election precincts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.031(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  During March or April of each even-numbered
 [odd-numbered] year, each commissioners court shall determine
 whether the county election precincts comply with Sections 42.005,
 42.006, and 42.007. [The commissioners court may make that
 determination during March or April of an even-numbered year.]
 Before May 1 of the year in which the determination is made, the
 commissioners court shall order the boundary changes necessary for
 compliance.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.033(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A change in a county election precinct boundary takes
 effect on the first day of the first odd-numbered [even-numbered
 voting] year following the [voting] year in which the change is
 ordered.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *