Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2709 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021