Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2709 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Johnson of Dallas (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2709
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the county in which an application for court-ordered
 mental health services must be filed.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 574.001(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), the application
 must be filed with the county clerk in the county in which the
 proposed patient:
 (1)  resides;
 (2)  is found; [or]
 (3)  is being assessed in an emergency room or
 hospital; or
 (4)  is receiving mental health services by court order
 or under Subchapter A, Chapter 573.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *