Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2792 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021